Date of birth/Age: | Oct 15, 1953 (70) |
---|---|
Place of Birth: | Mersin |
Citizenship: | Türkiye |
Avg. term as coach: |
0.30 Years |
Memduh Özbalta
- Date of birth/Age: Oct 15, 1953 (70)
- Place of birth: Mersin
- Citizenship: Türkiye
- Avg. term as coach : 0.30 Years
Personal Details
Stats
No information available.
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mersin IY Manager | 17/18 (Nov 23, 2017) | 17/18 (Jan 30, 2018) | 6 | 0.00 | ||
Mersin IY Assistant Manager | 16/17 (Feb 9, 2017) | 16/17 (Mar 2, 2017) | - | 0.00 | ||
Assistant Manager of: Alaattin Gülerce (1 Game) | ||||||
Mersin IY Academy manager | 16/17 (Dec 6, 2016) | 16/17 (Feb 3, 2017) | - | 0.00 | ||
Silifke Belediye Manager | 14/15 (Aug 26, 2014) | 14/15 (Jun 30, 2015) | - | 0.00 | ||
Mersin IY Academy manager | 11/12 (Jul 1, 2011) | 12/13 (Sep 18, 2012) | - | 0.00 | ||
Erdemli Bld Manager | 09/10 (Sep 18, 2009) | 09/10 (Dec 31, 2009) | - | 0.00 | ||
Mezitlispor Manager | 07/08 (Sep 14, 2007) | 07/08 (Oct 3, 2007) | - | 0.00 | ||
Yeni Ereglispor Manager | 05/06 (Nov 24, 2005) | 05/06 (Feb 6, 2006) | - | 0.00 | ||
Alibeyköy Manager | 05/06 (Sep 6, 2005) | 05/06 (Nov 23, 2005) | - | 0.00 |